DE SB188 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
This Act increases the $2,000 pension exclusion otherwise available for military pensioners under age 60 to $12,500, providing an incentive for military retirees under age 60 to locate in Delaware.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Exclusion Of Military Pensions From Taxable Income.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-20 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-21 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2022-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-14 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2022-05-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Veterans Affairs) in House with 9 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2022-05-11 | Re-Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in House | |
2022-03-16 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House | |
2022-03-15 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-03-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 Favorable | |
2022-03-09 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2022-03-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2022-01-27 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 188, and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate |