DE SB188 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-13 - Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-13 - Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill vests judges with discretion to determine “habitual offender” sentences, rather than the Attorney General’s staff. It also permits some offenders whose sentences were determined by the Attorney General’s Office to be resentenced by judges.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Habitual Offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-13 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 12 YES 9 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |