DE SB187 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill provides a safe alternative for the return of prohibited campaign and suspected prohibited campaign contributions. This bill allows a reporting party to donate a prohibited or suspected prohibited contribution to a charitable organization listed in Subchapter IX, Chapter 11 of Title 30 of the Delaware Code.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Campaign Contributions And Expenditures.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Marshall [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Rep. Edward Osienski [D] |
Sen. Patricia Blevins [D] | Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] | Sen. Charles Paradee [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 27 YES 14 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-05-14 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 11 YES 7 NO 3 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES/ELECTIONS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Administrative Services/Elections Committee in Senate |