DE SB186 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill requires entities contribute more than $100 to a political committees during an election cycle to disclose the name and address of a “responsible party”—that is, someone who shares or exercises direction or control over the entity’s activities. In so doing, this bill provides voters with additional information about where political money comes from, so they can better decide how to cast their votes. In addition, to help political committees and contributors accurately interpret and apply the law relating to the attribution of entity contributions, this bill requires the Elections Commissioner to adopt a uniform summary of the law in this area, with illustrative examples of how the law applies in specific cases. The Elections Commissioner is required to post the summary on its web site, and political committees are required to provide the summary to entity contributors at the request of such contributors.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Contributions By Entities To Political Committees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 2 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-25 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 3 On Its Merits |
2014-06-18 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 12 YES 9 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Lifted From Table in Senate |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Laid On Table in Senate |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES/ELECTIONS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to Administrative Services/Elections Committee in Senate |