DE SB185 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-10)
Status: Passed on August 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-10)
Status: Passed on August 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The Act generally requires lobbyists to disclose the bill, resolution, or regulation on which they are lobbying by making an electronic filing with the Public Integrity Commission within five business days of contact with a relevant public official. For budget appropriations bills and bond and capital improvements bills, the Act requires identification of the subject in the bill being lobbied. The Act further requires that the Public Integrity Commission, in coordination with Legislative Council and with the assistance of the Government Information Center, make such reports available on the internet in a manner in which they can be easily reviewed by bill, resolution, regulation, lobbyist or employer, and that regular updates be distributed to members of the General Assembly. Finally, the Act requires lobbyists to file registration forms registration and financial disclosure forms electronically. It also shortens the time frame for reporting updated lobbyist information to five business days, which will be consistent with the reporting period under the Act and reflects the ease of filing the updates electronically.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Registration Of Lobbyists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-17 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 26 YES 12 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-05-17 | Amendment HA 2 - Stricken | |
2012-05-17 | Amendment HA 1 - Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 14 YES 23 NO 1 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-05-17 | Amendment HA 1 defeated | |
2012-05-17 | Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 20 YES 16 NO 2 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-05-17 | Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 defeated | |
2012-05-17 | Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2012-05-15 | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2012-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2012-05-03 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2012-05-03 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House | |
2012-05-02 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 5 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-05-02 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-05-02 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate | |
2012-04-25 | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2012-04-03 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |