DE SB184 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Amendment HA 1 to SB 184 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act clarifies Delawares driving under the influence (DUI) law related to intensive inpatient or outpatient drug and alcohol treatment for felony DUI offenders. The current law has resulted in differing interpretations regarding treatment; specifically, whether treatment must be completed while incarcerated (Level V) or at home confinement (Level IV), rather than at community supervision (Level III or Level II). This has resulted in extending incarceration for some offenders or requiring out-of-state offenders to reside in Delaware to complete the mandated drug and alcohol abstinence program and drug and alcohol treatment program under ยง 4177(d)(9) of Title 21.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Driving A Vehicle While Under The Influence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27 Amendment HA 1 to SB 184 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2020-01-29 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 3 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2020-01-24 Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
2020-01-23 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2020-01-23 Amendment SA 1 to SB 184 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2020-01-22 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2020-01-21 Amendment SA 1 to SB 184 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2019-07-31 Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback