DE SB183 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

This bill continues the practice of amending periodically the Delaware Limited Liability Company Act (the "Act") to keep it current and to maintain its national preeminence. The following is a section-by-section review of the proposed amendments of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Chapter 18, Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Creation, Regulation, Operation And Dissolution Of Domestic Limited Liability Companies And The Registration And Regulation Of Foreign Limited Liability Companies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-23 Signed by Governor
2018-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 5 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2018-06-06 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
2018-06-05 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-05-09 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-04-26 Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback