DE SB183 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 20 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - SS 1 for SB 183 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this Bill is to remove the epilogue language from the Budget Bill and add this language to Title 14, establishing the Prison Education Unit. It establishes a minimum of ten teacher FTEs as Career and Technical Education Teachers for the purpose of providing job skills training to inmates before their release from a correctional facility. It also requires the Department of Correction’s Staff Training Unit to provide personnel to the Department of Education’s minimum qualification application review process for the selection of candidates for an interview. It requires the Department of Correction’s Bureau of Prisons to provide personnel to the Department of Education’s interview committee for the selection of new employees, and establishes a minimum time for the Department of Education to inform the Department of Correction of new hires for the mandatory Security Training Program provided by the Department of Corrections. Finally, it establishes the Governor’s Advisory Council for Exceptional Citizens as the third-party review agency for these prison Education Unit’s programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Department Of Correction Educational Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-20 SS 1 for SB 183 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2012-06-20 SS 1 for SB 183 - Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2012-06-14 SS 1 for SB 183 - Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2012-06-13 SS 1 for SB 183 - Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
2012-04-25 Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 183
2012-03-22 Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback