DE SB183 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]

Summary

This Bill removes the word experimental because it is not defined.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 7, Chapter 5 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Game Preserves.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-12 Signed by Governor
2010-06-24 Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2010-06-09 Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 10 On Its Merits
2010-04-01 Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House
2010-03-31 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2010-03-31 Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2010-03-31 Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate
2010-03-17 Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2010-01-12 Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback