DE SB182 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-30 - Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House
Pending: House Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act makes the following changes related to traffic control devices erected on order of the Secretary of the Department of Transportation (Secretary) limiting the size and weight of vehicles and loads permitted on a specific highway:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Traffic Control Devices For Size And Weight Of Vehicles And Loads.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-30 Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House
2020-01-29 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2020-01-29 Amendment SA 1 to SB 182 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2020-01-22 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2019-07-31 Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback