DE SB181 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act makes clear that the Town of Delmar, Delaware is a public employer for purposes of the Police Officers' and Firefighters' Employment Relations Act, Chapter 16 of Title 19 of the Delaware Code, and Chapter 16 of Title 19 applies to the Town, including in a cooperative agreement between the Town of Delmar, Delaware and the Town of Delmar, Maryland.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code And The Charter Of The Town Of Delmar Relating To The Police Officers' And Firefighters' Employment Relations Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-07 Signed by Governor
2021-06-29 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2021-06-24 Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 11 Favorable
2021-06-23 Assigned to Labor Committee in House
2021-06-22 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NOT VOTING
2021-06-22 Roll Call Rescinded in Senate
2021-06-22 Reconsidered in Senate
2021-06-22 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2021-06-22 Lifted From Table in Senate
2021-06-17 Laid On Table in Senate
2021-06-16 Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 4 Favorable
2021-06-10 Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback