DE SB181 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill makes several changes to the Child Protection Registry. First, it provides the requirement for a hearing for every child prior to placement on the registry and requires the appointment of counsel. The bill reorganizes the Court findings required for placement on the registry by creating a new Section, 925A. The bill sets out criteria to be considered by the Court for early removal from the registry and provides a mechanism for persons to be removed from the registry if they were placed on the registry as a child. The bill adds new child abuse crimes to the registry. The bill extends the timeline to file a Petition. Finally, the bill provides for a Limited Purpose Hearing for those who are placed on the registry as a result of a criminal conviction.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Child Protection Registry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-11 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 7 On Its Merits |
2014-06-04 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Stricken |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |