DE SB180 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-21 - Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-21 - Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act revises the circumstances under which an applicant can be denied a license by the Real Estate Commission because of a criminal conviction. Similar to the recent changes made other professional license requirements, this Act does all of the following:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Real Estate Services, Brokers, Associate Brokers And Salespersons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-16 | Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2022-06-15 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2022-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 3 Favorable | |
2021-06-10 | Introduced and Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate |