DE SB180 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
This Bill is the Fiscal Year 2020 Bond and Capital Improvements Act.
Title
A Bond And Capital Improvements Act Of The State Of Delaware And Certain Of Its Authorities For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2020; Authorizing The Issuance Of General Obligation Bonds Of The State; Appropriating Funds From The Transportation Trust Fund; Authorizing The Issuance Of Revenue Bonds Of The Delaware Transportation Authority; Appropriating Special Funds Of The Delaware Transportation Authority; Appropriating General Funds Of The State; Reprogramming Certain Funds Of The State; Specifying Certain Procedures, Conditions And Limitations For The Expenditure Of Such Funds; And Amending Certain Statutory Provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-06-30 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2019-06-30 | Lifted From Table in House | |
2019-06-30 | Laid On Table in House | |
2019-06-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-06-27 | Suspension of Rules in Senate |