DE SB180 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Section 1. Section 1 of this Act amends Section 102(a)(1) to provide that the name of a corporation must be such as to distinguish it from the name of any registered series of a limited liability company.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 8 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The General Corporation Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 3 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-06 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2018-06-05 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-26 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |