DE SB18 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Laid On Table in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Laid On Table in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act allows retail dealers in Sussex County to sell gasoline that does not contain ethanol if the gasoline is being used in watercraft. Sussex County comfortably meets the National Ambient Air Quality Standard for ground level ozone and removing ethanol from marine fuel will have no significant impact on ambient ozone levels.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Sale Of Fuels.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2021-05-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment & Energy) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2021-03-09 | Amendment SA 2 to SB 18 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-01-26 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 18 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-01-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee in Senate |