DE SB179 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act clarifies the language enacted by Senate Bill No. 139 of the 150th General Assembly (SB 139) regarding when dogs may be permitted to run at large. This Act corrects errors in § 1325 of Title 11 and § 3048F of Title 16, by making revisions to conform the Code so it is consistent with the policy changes enacted by SB 139 and the standards of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 And Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Animal Welfare.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-06-25 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-06-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-18 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2021-06-17 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 NO | |
2021-06-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-09 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |