DE SB179 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Assigned to Energy Committee in House
Pending: House Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act clarifies that the Public Advocate may appear before any federal or state court or federal or state administrative body in matters involving public utility rates, service, practices, and energy policy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating The Division Of The Public Advocate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10 Assigned to Energy Committee in House
2018-05-09 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-05-02 Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-04-25 Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback