DE SB179 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act is intended to clarify the offense of Resisting Arrest by making grammatical changes.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Resisting Arrest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-12 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-14 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 6 Favorable |
2014-05-07 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Lifted From Table in Senate |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Laid On Table in Senate |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |