DE SB177 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act brings Delaware sex offender registration laws into compliance with the federal Sex Offender Registration and Notification Act ("SORNA") by standardizing the tier designation of sex offenders are assigned based upon offense of conviction. This Act removes discretion previously granted to the Board of Parole to redesignate sex offenders and standardizes designation in a manner consistent with established Superior Court precedent. See State v. Brown, 2013 WL 2149882 (Del. Super. 2013); Lane v. Board of Parole, 2012 WL 5509711 (Del. Super. 2012). Finally, this Act streamlines the designation process by directing review to the Superior Court in the first instance.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Registration Of Sexual Offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-19 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 10 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-09 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2018-05-08 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-05-02 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-25 | Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate |