DE SB177 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act makes a technical correction to clarify language relating to the jurisdiction and powers of the Delaware Public Service Commission for public utilities that provide telecommunications services.
Title
An Act To Amend Sections 201(c), 201(d) And 706(d) Of Title 26 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Jurisdiction And Powers Of The Public Service Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Bushweller [D] | Sen. Charles Paradee [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] |
Sen. Gerald Hocker [R] | Rep. Richard Collins [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Committee (TELECOMMUNICATION INTERNET & TECHNOLOGY) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Telecommunication Internet & Technology Committee in House |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (INSURANCE & TELECOMMUNICATIONS) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance & Telecommunications Committee in Senate |