DE SB177 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Criminals who attempt to prevent victims or witnesses from cooperating with the investigation and prosecution of crimes pose a real and growing threat to public safety and the orderly administration of justice. This Act seeks to deter criminals and their associates from harassing and intimidating victims and witnesses by increasing the punishment imposed upon those convicted of the existing crimes of Act of Intimidation and Aggravated Act of Intimidation. The Act reclassifies Act of Intimidation as a Class D felony, and Aggravated Act of Intimidation as a Class B felony.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Related To Witness Intimidation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 6 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2014-04-08 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |