DE SB177 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This is a housekeeping initiative to amend Title 4 of the Delaware to repeal 402 which states that the Division of Alcohol and Tobacco Enforcement’s (DATE) main office is in New Castle County, Delaware. As a state agency, DATE provides services to all three counties in Delaware and this gives DATE the flexibility to centralize and improve the efficiency of its operations. DATE plans to continue to maintain its office in Wilmington at the Carvel State Office Building.
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 4, Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Division Of Alcohol And Tobacco Enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-30 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2012-06-21 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2012-06-20 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits | |
2012-03-22 | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate |