DE SB177 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Section 1 through 6 of this bill will enhance the penalties for persons convicted under 4177 whose BAC is .15 or greater and persons whose BAC is .15 or greater and who elect to participate in the First Offense Election – Ignition Interlock Diversion Program pursuant to 4177B(g). Specifically, it increases the period of revocation from 3 months to 6 months and of hard revocation from 30 days to no earlier than 45 days. It further mandates the use of the ignition interlock device for a period of 6 months. It will also limit the locations to which an offender may drive after the installation of an ignition interlock device to work, home, school, alcohol treatment programs and interlock service providers. Passage of sections 1 through 6 will also qualify the State of Delaware to receive a federal grant in the amount of $500,000.00 for highway safety initiatives.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Rules Of The Road
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-07-01 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-07-01 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2009-06-30 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2009-06-29 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 1 VACANT | |
2009-06-29 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |