DE SB174 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends the Charter of The Town of Milton. Specifically, this Act does all of the following:
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Town Of Milton.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-06-25 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-18 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2021-06-17 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-08 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |