DE SB174 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill recognizes tobacco and nicotine products as contraband in correctional facilities.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Prison Contraband.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-30 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in House |
2014-04-10 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Corrections Committee in House |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 12 YES 9 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (ADULT & JUVENILE CORRECTIONS) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to Adult & Juvenile Corrections Committee in Senate |