DE SB173 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act is a comprehensive update to the Charter of Dewey Beach that makes both substantive and technical revisions to diminish instances of ambiguous language and eliminate the use of archaic terms and duplicative provisions.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Town Of Dewey Beach.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-06-25 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-18 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2021-06-17 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-17 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 173 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-17 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 173 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-08 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |