DE SB173 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-30 - Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 1 Favorable, 10 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-30 - Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 1 Favorable, 10 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act establishes the Universal Pre-K Consortium to recommend a comprehensive plan for the implementation of a mixed-delivery, non-compulsory public pre-kindergarten program for all 4 year olds in this State.
Title
An Act To Establish The Universal Pre-k Consortium.
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Sturgeon [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Lockman [D] | Rep. Earl Jaques [D] | Rep. Kimberly Williams [D] |
Sen. Catherine Cloutier [R] | Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 1 Favorable, 10 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-27 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 173 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-06-27 | Assigned to Education Committee in House | |
2019-06-26 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-06-26 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 173 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-25 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |