DE SB171 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-9)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 9 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Individuals who are released from prison face many hurdles as they re-enter the community, including difficulty obtaining identification documents. Lacking identification imposes additional hurdles as these individuals attempt to find housing and employment. This Act requires the Department of Correction to provide individuals who are being released from the custody of the Department of Correction ("DOC"), after 6 months of incarceration following conviction, with a Delaware Personal Credential Card ("Personal Credential"). An individual may present the Personal Credential to receive one free certified copy of the individual's birth certificate and one identification card or driver's license, if otherwise eligible to receive those documents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16, Title 21, And Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Free Identification Documents For Individuals Being Released From Prison.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2018-05-08 Re-Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
2018-05-08 Assigned to Corrections Committee in House
2018-05-03 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-04-25 Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2018-04-18 Introduced and Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback