DE SB171 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-9)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-30 - Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-30 - Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Individuals who are released from prison face many hurdles as they re-enter the community, including difficulty obtaining identification documents. Lacking identification imposes additional hurdles as these individuals attempt to find housing and employment. This Act requires the Department of Correction to provide individuals who are being released from the custody of the Department of Correction ("DOC"), after 6 months of incarceration following conviction, with a Delaware Personal Credential Card ("Personal Credential"). An individual may present the Personal Credential to receive one free certified copy of the individual's birth certificate and one identification card or driver's license, if otherwise eligible to receive those documents.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16, Title 21, And Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Free Identification Documents For Individuals Being Released From Prison.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-08 | Re-Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2018-05-08 | Assigned to Corrections Committee in House | |
2018-05-03 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-04-25 | Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-18 | Introduced and Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate |