DE SB170 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 7 YES 3 NO 11 NOT VOTING
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 7 YES 3 NO 11 NOT VOTING
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Currently, Delaware law permits the display of a flag of the United States of America on a flagpole attached to a residential structure. The law also permits display on a flagpole on the premises, but only if the flagpole was installed prior to the termination of developer control. This bill would remove that restriction, such that an individual would be permitted to display a flag of the United States of America on a flagpole even if the flagpole was installed after termination of developer control and regardless of other community association restrictions, deed restrictions, or other restrictions to the contrary.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 25 Of Delaware Code Relating To Display Of Flags.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | Defeated By Senate. Votes: 7 YES 3 NO 11 NOT VOTING | |
2022-06-23 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2022-06-22 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2021-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |