DE SB170 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

This bill increases the minimum wage to be paid in this State beginning in 2018 and ending in 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Minimum Wage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Signed by Governor
2018-07-01 Passed By House. Votes: 21 YES 18 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2018-07-01 Amendment HA 2 to SB 170 - Defeated By House. Votes: 20 YES 20 NO 1 ABSENT
2018-06-30 Passed By Senate. Votes: 11 YES 10 NO
2018-06-30 Amendment SA 1 to SB 170 - Laid On Table in Senate
2018-06-30 Amendment SA 2 to SB 170 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 11 YES 8 NO 2 NOT VOTING
2018-06-30 Lifted From Table in Senate
2018-06-30 Lifted From Table in Senate
2018-06-30 Laid On Table in Senate
2018-06-28 Amendment SA 1 to SB 170 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-03-28 Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback