DE SB169 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This Act makes a technical correction to SB 169 by changing the designations of the new statutes and incorporates Senate Amendment No. 1 to Senate Bill No. 169.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Sexual Offenses And Sexual Relations In A Detention Facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 11 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-08 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2018-05-03 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-05-03 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 169 |