DE SB168 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 2 Favorable, 13 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

According to the U.S. Bureau of Justice Statistics, an estimated 42% of all face-to-face contact between individuals and law-enforcement officers occurred during a traffic stop.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14, Title 18, And Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Driver Education On Traffic Stop Procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 2 Favorable, 13 On Its Merits
2018-06-06 Assigned to Education Committee in House
2018-06-05 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-06-05 Amendment SA 1 to SB 168 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-04-26 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2018-03-28 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback