DE SB167 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - Amendment HA 1 to SB 167 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - Amendment HA 1 to SB 167 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act requires that the State food safety standards include a system for grading and classifying inspection results that identifies and represents a food establishment's degree of compliance with the standards. This Act also requires that the Department of Health and Social Services form a stakeholder panel to provide advice regarding the content of the system for grading and classifying inspection results for food establishments, which will be effective on July 1, 2021.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Inspections Of Food Establishments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 167 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-21 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2019-06-20 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 2 NO 3 ABSENT | |
2019-06-20 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 167 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2019-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-18 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |