DE SB167 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act exempts solids and confections containing 2% or less alcohol by weight from the definition of alcoholic liquor.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Definition Of Alcoholic Liquors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-03-27 | House | Re-Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |
2014-03-27 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Lifted From Table in Senate |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Laid On Table in Senate |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (SMALL BUSINESS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Small Business Committee in Senate |