DE SB165 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Passed By House. Votes: 25 YES 13 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act permits private sector labor organizations and employers to enter into union security agreements to the full extent allowed under federal law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Union Security Agreements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21 Passed By House. Votes: 25 YES 13 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2018-05-09 Assigned to Labor Committee in House
2018-05-08 Passed By Senate. Votes: 12 YES 8 NO 1 ABSENT
2018-05-02 Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-03-22 Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback