DE SB163 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-23 - Assigned to Administration Committee in House
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-23 - Assigned to Administration Committee in House
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This bill updates the States charter school law to codify the original intent of charter schools to encourage the use of different and innovative or proven school environments and teaching and learning methods; provide parents and students with measures of improved school and student performance and greater opportunities in choosing public schools within and outside their school districts; and to provide for a well-educated community.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Charter Schools.
Sponsors
Sen. David Sokola [D] | Rep. Peter Schwartzkopf [D] | Sen. Kyle Gay [D] | Sen. Kyra Hoffner [D] |
Sen. Brian Pettyjohn [R] | Rep. Kevin Hensley [R] | Rep. Sean Lynn [D] | Rep. Michael Ramone [R] |
Rep. Michael Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-23 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2023-06-22 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |
2023-06-22 | Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-06-21 | Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2023-06-20 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 163 |