DE SB162 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends the Charter of Millville to give the Town Council the authority to impose and collect a lodging tax.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of Millville Relating To The Power To Impose And Collect A Lodging Tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 NO | |
2019-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-26 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2019-06-25 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-25 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 162 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2019-06-20 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 162 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-06-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-18 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate |