DE SB162 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-25 - Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-25 - Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill expands the crime of possession and purchase of deadly weapons by persons prohibited to include perpetrators of violent crimes who have been found Not Guilty By Reason of Insanity, Guilty But Mentally Ill, or Mentally Incompetent to Stand Trial, including juveniles who fall into those categories.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Possession And Purchase Of Deadly Weapons By Persons Prohibited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-25 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |