DE SB160 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act revises and improves the New Castle County Board of Assessment Review ("Board") by making revisions that are the result of practical lessons learned over the years of the Board's operation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 9 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The New Castle County Board Of Assessment Review.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24 Signed by Governor
2018-05-10 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT
2018-04-25 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2018-04-18 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
2018-04-17 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2018-03-28 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2018-03-19 Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback