DE SB160 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act revises and improves the New Castle County Board of Assessment Review ("Board") by making revisions that are the result of practical lessons learned over the years of the Board's operation.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 9 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The New Castle County Board Of Assessment Review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-05-10 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT | |
2018-04-25 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-18 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2018-04-17 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2018-03-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-19 | Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate |