DE SB160 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on May 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on May 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The bill would increase the weight limit for live-haul poultry trucks operating on Delaware highways within 100 miles of the plant in order to accommodate the poultry industry and ensure public safety. In addition, the bill would provide for a weight variance of 3 percent to account for variations in bird weight. Live-haul poultry trucks are granted the increased weight limit and associated variance provided that these trucks are in compliance with several conditions aimed at ensuring public safety. Provided these conditions are met, this bill would allow a live-haul poultry truck to weigh up to 92,700 pounds before any penalty is assessed for exceeding weight restrictions. The weight variance provided for in this bill is the same weight variance granted to vehicles used for farm operations by 4502(c)(9) of Title 21.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Gross Vehicle Weight Of Live-haul Poultry Trucks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Committee (AGRICULTURE) in House with 6 Favorable |
2014-03-19 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HIGHWAYS & TRANSPORTATION) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Highways & Transportation Committee in Senate |