DE SB16 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act authorizes the Division of Motor Vehicles (Division) to issue special registration plates to motorcycle clubs without having to enact a special law for each request. A motorcycle club must have 50 applications for its special registration plate before the Division is required to issue a special registration plate; however, the requirement is reduced to 25 for certain motorcycle clubs.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Special Registration Plates For Motorcycles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-05-16 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-04-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-21 | Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2019-03-20 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2019-03-20 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 16 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2019-03-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-01-22 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate |