DE SB16 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends Section 2306 of Delaware’s probate code to clarify that if a decedent owned real estate in Delaware, either solely or as tenants in common, the small estate affidavit authorized by Section 2306 of Delaware’s probate code should not be issued and, therefore, the grant of letters for the estate shall be necessary, pursuant to Chapter 15 of Title 12 of the Delaware Code. This bill is a substitute bill because unexplained printing errors appeared in the final version of the bill.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 12 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Issuance Of Small Estate Affidavits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2015-03-25 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Re-Assigned to Judiciary committee in Senate |
2015-01-29 | Senate | was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 16 |