DE SB159 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 19 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 NO
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]

Summary

The Act made changes to motor vehicle franchising practices, by doing the following:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Commerce And Trade.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 NO
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 12 On Its Merits
2018-05-30 Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
2018-05-10 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2018-05-02 was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 159

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback