DE SB158 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act allows a person to land food fish in Delaware that was caught using equipment or a method illegal in Delaware waters if the food fish was caught in the fishery conservation zone, the person has the necessary State and federal permits, the amount of the food fish is in compliance with an established State quota, and the equipment or method is legal the fishery conservation zone. This change is necessary so that a person who needs to fish in the fishery conservation zone to reach an established State quota of fish can safely and efficiently land the fish in Delaware.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Types Of Fishing Equipment And Methods Used For Fishing For Food Fish.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05 Signed by Governor
2018-03-29 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
2018-03-28 Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 1 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits
2018-03-22 Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House
2018-03-15 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2018-03-15 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-03-13 Introduced and Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback