DE SB157 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Expedited partner therapy (EPT) is the clinical practice of treating the sex partners of patients diagnosed with a sexually transmitted disease without clinical assessment of the partners. In August 2006, the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) recommended EPT as an evidence-based option to manage chlamydial infection and gonorrhea by treating index patients sex partners to prevent reinfection and curtail further transmission. As of July 2017, EPT is permissible in 41 states.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Expedited Partner Therapy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-29 Signed by Governor
2018-06-12 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
2018-05-09 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2018-05-01 Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2018-04-26 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-04-26 Amendment SA 1 to SB 157 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-04-26 Amendment SA 1 to SB 157 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-04-18 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2018-03-16 Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback