DE SB156 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act requires that prevailing wages be paid to laborers and mechanics working on all University of Delaware construction sites or renovation projects that exceed a certain cost. The prevailing wages are set by the Delaware Department of Labor, Division of Industrial Affairs, and apply to various classes of laborers and mechanics, according to the county in which the work is performed.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Charter Of The University Of Delaware.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-09 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Passed By House. Votes: 31 YES 9 NO | |
2021-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 6 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-16 | Assigned to Labor Committee in House | |
2021-06-15 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 3 NO 1 NOT VOTING | |
2021-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate |