DE SB155 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Tabled in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act prohibits a flagger from using headphones or electronic communication devices while engaged in traffic control in a work zone. This Act permits a flagger to use an electronic communication device approved by the Department of Transportation. This Act makes a violation of this prohibition a civil traffic offense that is not entered on an individuals motor vehicle record.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 17 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Road Construction Flaggers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Tabled in Committee
2018-04-12 Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House
2018-03-29 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-03-28 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-03-09 Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback